Trustees THE BLETCHLEY OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE
Charity number: 208832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Carmichael | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Whitley | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Keeling | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Diamond | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Loder | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Morgan | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill James | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.