Trustees THE PRINTING CHARITY
Charity number: 208882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Phillips | Chair | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elenor Hamshire | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sayandhan Mathavan | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Cook | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Hay | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Bernstein | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neal | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Bull | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Blake | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Cole | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.