Financial history THE SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS ABROAD

Charity number: 209015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.94m £8.07m £8.74m £10.02m £9.22m
Total expenditure £7.72m £8.46m £9.85m £7.96m £7.90m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £251.17k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.75m £7.84m £8.52m £9.54m £8.91m
Income - Other trading activities £48.27k £0 £55.10k £86.39k £74.01k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £59.06k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £142.57k £166.62k £167.64k £140.66k £126.73k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £251.17k £109.00k
Income - Legacies £3.98m £4.24m £4.66m £5.54m £4.98m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.06m £5.35m £6.39m £5.21m £5.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.66m £3.09m £3.46m £2.75m £2.57m
Expenditure - Governance £30.43k £30.53k £0 £82.44k £51.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £253.09k £0 £0 £3.32m
Expenditure - Investment management £43.87k £47.95k £79.33k £45.25k £50.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £23.04k £0 £0 £0