Financial history THE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 209139
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.39k £2.12k £4.59k £2.84k £2.98k
Total expenditure £2.56k £2.19k £7.60k £2.05k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A