Batley Community Centre

Charity number: 209180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.34k £19.14k £27.49k £33.78k £24.87k
Total expenditure £25.39k £24.24k £19.48k £27.19k £23.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.30k £16.42k