Governing document Adelphi Genetics Forum
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/11/1926 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/05/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2013 as amended on 08 Sep 2021 as amended on 29 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 The objects of the Forum are, for the public benefit, the advancement of education by:- 3.1.1 facilitating scholarly and public discussion of all aspects of the science of human genetics; 3.1.2 facilitating well informed teaching on the science of human genetics; and 3.1.3 promoting research into the science of human genetics and disseminating useful results.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.