Trustees BRITISH SOFT DRINKS INDUSTRY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 209296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN NICHOLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT THOMAS WATSON | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COLIN TURNER | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NELLIST | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Arpino | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAVID JOHN VALDER | Trustee | 11 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Dale Peck | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM ROBIN GRAHAM BARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD SINCLAIR CHARLTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.