Financial history DAVID HENRY WARING HOME

Charity number: 209301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £48.47k £54.32k £65.12k £50.64k £46.71k
Total expenditure £258.13k £136.41k £219.22k £166.07k £136.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A