Trustees A T D FOURTH WORLD LIMITED
Charity number: 209367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Letitia Jane Patricia Mason | Chair | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gertraud Ottilie Trivedi | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyle Barker | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aye Aye Win Lemmers | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul Christopher Haworth | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ralph Whitefoot | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ms Anna Gupta | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas George Mayes | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MICHELLE DAVIES | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.