Governing document CHARITY OF MRS SARAH BERNARD
Charity number: 209558
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 04/11/1774 AND SCHEMES DATED 7 JULY 1961, 2 APRIL 1963, 19 AUGUST 1970 AND 17 MAY 2011 04/11/1774 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS, POOR MARRIED COUPLES, BACHELORS OR WIDOWERS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARDFIELD OR WITHIN A DISTANCE OF 10 MILES FROM THE BOUNDARY OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ANCIENT PARISH OF BARDFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.