Financial history EDITH EMILY TODD

Charity number: 209922
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.00k £2.13k £2.22k £1.78k £3.24k
Total expenditure £1.59k £1.00k £4.10k £1.20k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A