UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND LETCHWORTH MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 210166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.14k £11.17k £15.13k £14.42k £16.81k
Total expenditure £10.10k £6.61k £57 £1.86k £1.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A