Trustees THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON

Charity number: 210228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Andrew Knights Chair 07 March 2021
None on record
Susan Glossop Trustee 07 June 2022
WEST STOW SAXON VILLAGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR JOHN WOOD, HENGRAVE AND FLEMPTON TRUST
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
Patrick Hung Chow Chung Trustee 01 June 2022
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
Thomas Murray Trustee 01 December 2021
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
Birgitte Mager Trustee 01 June 2021
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
John Augustine Trustee 29 September 2020
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mark Merriam Trustee 03 March 2020
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
George Edward James COCKRAM Trustee 16 October 2019
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Joseph Patricius Hawes Trustee 04 September 2018
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
OLD SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
Gregory Luton Trustee 05 June 2018
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
Hannah BLACK Trustee 07 March 2017
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
SIMON FRANCIS POTT FRICS Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DAY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ICKWORTH CHURCH CONSERVATION TRUST
Overdue by 59 days
GENERAL THE HONOURABLE SIR WILLIAM HERVEY
Overdue by 54 days
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
THE LITTLE GIDDING TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
HENRY REGINALD SALTMARSH FCA Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
VIRGINIA BEVERLEY DEAN Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS
Received: On time
MRS SUE SOPER Trustee
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time