Financial history CAXTON HOUSE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 210270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £263.99k £266.95k £322.87k £409.68k £307.65k
Total expenditure £264.16k £261.82k £283.30k £362.28k £306.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.45k £52.32k £87.38k £92.88k £68.05k