SUTTON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 210694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.31k £3.89k £3.97k £4.12k £4.12k
Total expenditure £3.31k £3.88k £3.97k £4.12k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A