Dogfen lywodraethu THE FOREBRIDGE CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 11 DEC 1961 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 MAY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29 OCT 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PURCHASE AND MAINTAIN A BLOCK OF RESIDENTIAL FLATS FOR OCCUPATION BY POOR INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION BY REASON OF OLD AGE OR OTHER CAUSES.
Maes buddion
THE ADMINISTRATIVE WARDS OF FOREBRIDGE; BASWICH; WEEPING CROSS & WILDWOOD; PENKSIDE; MANOR; HIGHFIELDS & WESTERN DOWNS; ROWLEY, DOXEY & CASTLETOWN; HOLMCROFT; COMMON; COTON AND LITTLEWORTH AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS IN THE BOROUGH OF STAFFORD.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.