Financial history SOROPTIMIST INTERNATIONAL GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND - EMERGENCY RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 211231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.05k £8.73k £8.16k £7.79k £68.91k
Total expenditure £20.55k £8.82k £9.85k £1.39k £11.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A