Financial history WIDOW'S CHARITY OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE POOR'S ESTATE

Charity number: 211504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.09k £2.13k £2.17k £2.22k £2.26k
Total expenditure £0 £12.35k £17.93k £3.00k £5.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A