Financial history THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 211588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £302.90k £205.98k £1.18m £644.04k £323.00k
Total expenditure £286.87k £205.56k £358.42k £364.61k £421.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £920.33k £432.23k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £254.97k £211.81k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £900.00k £360.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £282.81k £310.29k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £28.81k £27.03k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.21k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £261.51k £310.29k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £27.03k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £46.80k £27.30k N/A