Trustees QUEEN MARY'S ROEHAMPTON TRUST

Charity number: 211715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR BARRY MICHAEL THORNTON KCB Chair
None on record
Benjamin Marshall Trustee 04 May 2021
None on record
Air Commodore Barbara Cooper Trustee 01 December 2020
THE ROYAL AIR FORCE CLUB
Received: On time
Miranda Emma Thompson-Schwab Trustee 20 June 2018
Jerwood Charity
Received: On time
DR. VIVIAN CHILD CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 111 days
HEATHER BETTS Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
Dr Rakesh Bhabutta Trustee 21 June 2016
None on record
Anne Child Trustee 02 December 2014
None on record
COLONEL PAUL CUMMINGS Trustee
None on record
Major James Justin Macnamara TD VR JP Trustee
DR RADCLIFFE'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WESTMINSTER DRAGOONS REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE ELLEN MACNAMARA MEMORIAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ORDERS OF ST JOHN CARE TRUST
Received: On time
GROWGREENCARBON
Received: On time
BERKSHIRE YEOMANRY MUSEUM CIO
Received: On time
COLIN GREEN CBE Trustee
The Collegiate School Bristol
Received: On time