Financial history AILWYN LODGE NO 3535 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 211815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £2.53k £3.46k £4.64k £16.02k £24.00k
Total expenditure £1.40k £1.60k £1.65k £8.70k £14.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £18.71k