Financial history CORNER-STONE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 211833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.23k £1.42k £1.27k £1.18k £1.06k
Total expenditure £1.35k £1.16k £1.00k £1.00k £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A