MARY PETLEY

Charity number: 211857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required