BRENTFORD AND CHISWICK SICK POOR PERSONS FUND

Charity number: 211860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £474 £484 £494 £503 £514
Total expenditure £0 £240 £1.10k £775 £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A