Trustees NUCKELL'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 211897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michela Martin George | Chair | 20 February 2006 |
|
|||||
Rev Matt Hodder | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wyn Briggs | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bennett-Goodman | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS A LAWRENCE | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM OFFLEY HINCHLIFFE FRIEND | Trustee | 29 September 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.