Trustees THE POOR'S LAND CHARITY

Charity number: 212348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PETER WARREN GOODRIDGE Chair 23 September 2013
ELMSWELL CHURCH LAND CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF THE FOUNDATION OF SIR ROBERT GARDINER
Overdue by 267 days
Peter Dow Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Fred Pallett Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Gerald Curtis Trustee 11 October 2017
None on record
DICK BURCH Trustee 31 October 2016
None on record
IAN TULLETT Trustee 30 November 2015
None on record
ROBERT JAMES DYBALL Trustee 30 November 2015
None on record
LINDA ROSE WASPE Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
BARRY EDWARD BROUGH Trustee 04 December 2011
None on record
CARROL ANNE SADLER Trustee
None on record
DIANN ROSEMARY ARMSTRONG Trustee
None on record
DAVID HAWES Trustee
None on record
ANNA HAWES Trustee
None on record