Trustees MERCHANT NAVY WELFARE BOARD

Charity number: 212799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW KEITH CASSELS Chair 10 September 2012
None on record
Alexander Campbell Trustee 02 November 2023
NEIGHBOURS IN POPLAR
Received: On time
THE GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Received: On time
NATASHA BARLEY Trustee 07 September 2023
HULL TRUCK THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
HULL IMAGINATION LIBRARY
Recently registered
Louise Sara Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Richard Ballantyne Trustee 31 July 2021
None on record
Adrian Hodgson Trustee 25 June 2020
CUSTOM HOUSE AND CANNING TOWN COMMUNITY RENEWAL PROJECT
Received: On time
Darren Procter Trustee 25 June 2020
THE MARITIME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Justin Osmond Trustee 06 April 2018
None on record
David Appleton Trustee 30 November 2017
THE MARITIME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SEAFARERS HOSPITAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALISON GODFREY Trustee 23 August 2016
None on record
MARK ANTHONY CARDEN Trustee 10 September 2012
None on record
TIMOTHY EDWARD SPRINGETT BA Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM RICHARD LANE Trustee
None on record
Mark Dickinson Trustee
THE MARITIME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time