Financial history THE CHANTREY BEQUEST

Charity number: 212805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.58k £4.64k £3.71k £7.33k £14.54k
Total expenditure £2.68k £3.59k £2.69k £3.16k £37.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A