Trustees RICHARD WATTS AND THE CITY OF ROCHESTER ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Charity number: 212828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Povey | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Newman | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Gurteen | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Linda Reay | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kamaldeep Tesse | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MCCARTHY | Trustee | 18 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIZ JANZ | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES SMITH | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA JEAN CLARABUT | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.