TUDDENHAM PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 212838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £2.25k £2.42k £2.46k £2.53k £2.57k
Total expenditure £1.92k £2.11k £2.38k £2.40k £3.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A