Trustees BRAINTREE AND BOCKING PUBLIC GARDENS
Charity number: 212989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Payne | Chair | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Denise Mandy Dodson | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vince Eade | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Beatty | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Jane Littler | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Beckett | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA SANTOMAURO | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cornell | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tony Pritchard | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE PERTWEE | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.