THE REVEREND JOHN COWALL (OTHERWISE COWAN)

Charity number: 213123
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £24.16k £12.40k £2.60k £2.00k £1.76k
Total expenditure £22.82k £10.77k £9.07k £1.12k £2.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £250 N/A N/A N/A