Trustees BUDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 213441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia May | Chair | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sue Grant | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Barker | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cadd | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Flaxman | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Joy Deane-Daniels | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Stephenson | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Burch | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Trewin | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Harris | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Grice | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carole Edwards | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN RUTH SPARHAM | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAMIE LOUISA GRACE WILDMAN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ANN PEARCE | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.