Trustees SUDBURY MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 213516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Dale | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Sarah-Jane Money | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Peter Leonard Fulcher | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
Samantha Jane Hobson | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM KEMSLEY | Trustee | 25 July 2012 |
|
|||||||
ROSS BENTLEY | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM CHALLACOMBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MAY ONCA CATHARINA BERKOUWER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARK JAMES GEDDES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REVEREND RICHARD KIMBER TITFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PETER WHITELEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
KEITH ROBINS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.