Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - NEWQUAY

Charity number: 213535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.05k £29.20k £15.93k £16.24k £7.20k
Total expenditure £20.67k £38.03k £12.60k £16.17k £6.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A