Accounts and annual returns THE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 213936
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 January 2022 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required