Financial history THE BERWICK ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 214070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £58.75k £51.61k £55.25k £59.69k £58.85k
Total expenditure £42.00k £82.74k £27.00k £44.31k £37.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A