Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE FORMER INDEPENDENT CHAPEL IN BRUNSWICK SQUARE

Charity number: 214481
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 168 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 168 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2022 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2022 727 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2022 1093 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required