R L GLASSPOOL CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 214648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.00m £1.94m £2.20m £2.25m £2.16m
Total expenditure £2.00m £2.00m £2.02m £2.33m £2.25m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £50 £250 £1.09k £910 £627
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £80.00k £105.00k £105.00k £125.00k £205.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.92m £1.84m £2.09m £2.13m £1.95m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.00m £2.00m £2.02m £2.33m £2.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.25k £12.49k £19.02k £20.48k £30.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0