Dogfen lywodraethu HIBBERT ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 16/05/1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/02/2002 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 26/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 MAY 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WOMEN, MARRIED COUPLES OR MEN OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, FIRST PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO WOMEN, SECOND PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO MARRIED COUPLES AND THIRD PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO MEN.
Maes buddion
ANCIENT PARISH OF CLAPHAM.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.