Governing document ROYAL LONDON SOCIETY
Charity number: 214695
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH JUNE 1963 AS AMENDED ON THE 8TH MARCH 1971, 9TH JUNE 1980, 28TH SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 16 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PRISONERS BOTH BEFORE AND AFTER DISCHARGE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS BEING PROPER OBJECTS OF CHARITY AND IN WAYS THAT ARE CHARITABLE, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.