THE GRASMERE GREEN'S AND POOR'S CHARITY

Charity number: 214766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £107 £75 £60 £81 £95
Total expenditure £252 £250 £256 £215 £190
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A