THE DERBY CITY CHARITY

Charity number: 214902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.26k £3.02k £3.90k £5.16k £5.71k
Total expenditure £1.50k £2.54k £3.50k £4.11k £1
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A