Trustees THE FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL LEWISHAM
Charity number: 214939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Nigel Baylis | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Ann Russell | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE FULCHER | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Jack Riley | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|||||
REV KEVIN PARKES | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUTH COCHRANE | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr VALERIE FAIRBRASS | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.