DUDLEY AND OTHERS

Charity number: 215375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.27k £4.56k £5.36k £6.00k £6.00k
Total expenditure £1.80k £5.87k £1.55k £1.44k £407
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A