Trustees THE NEWCOMEN SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 215410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr Vaughan Pomeroy Chair 01 March 2018
None on record
Professor Frank Arthur John Lord James Trustee 01 March 2022
THE LEONARDO DA VINCI SOCIETY
Received: On time
Simon Edward Christopher Jump Trustee 01 March 2022
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr Francesco Gerali Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
David James Hardwick Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Dr John William Kanefsky Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Graham Orchard Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Professor Felix Schmid Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
David Edgar Eaton Trustee 01 March 2020
KEN HAWLEY COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTH YORKSHIRE TRADES HISTORICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Peter Francis Grisdale Filcek Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Dr Catherine Mary Casson Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Robert James Bowden Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Dr Oliver Carpenter Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record
Daniel H W Hayton Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record
Dr Jonathan Aylen Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
JULIA MARGARET HALLAM ELTON Trustee
SOCIETY FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FAITH
Received: On time
SABINA SUTHERLAND CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time