DAME ALICE OWEN'S ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES

Charity number: 215543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.07k £7.05k £7.47k £8.21k £12.82k
Total expenditure £6.89k £7.23k £6.02k £6.30k £6.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A