CHARITY OF MARJORIE HURST

Charity number: 215596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £41.54k £44.14k £44.08k £45.11k £45.93k
Total expenditure £15.77k £18.52k £23.50k £27.41k £28.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A