Trustees THE FRIENDS OF HEREFORD CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 215663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUGLAS ANTHONY BARRAT | Chair | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Warner | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wynne Griffiths | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Willmott | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Semple Mrs | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iris Eileen Howlett | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Owen | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Erica Mary Hillman | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wg Cmdr Peter Hereford | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr BARBARA JOY RODERICK | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS DOUGLAS RODERICK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.