THE STUART GOODWIN CHARITY

Charity number: 215976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.34k £4.26k £2.53k £3.52k £4.24k
Total expenditure £3.96k £1.87k £4.13k £2.35k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A